EP4094248 - REDUCING BORDER WIDTH AROUND A HOLE IN DISPLAY ACTIVE AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEUTORT-LOUIS, Warren, S. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
JAMSHIDI ROUDBARI, Abbas One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
CHE, Yuchi One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
TSAI, Tsung-ting One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
CHANG, Jiun-Jye One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
CHANG, Shih, Chang One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
CHANG, Ting-kuo One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Froud, Christopher Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21714556.4 | 04.03.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US20873 | Priority number, date | US202063001949P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001949 P | US202117145815 | 11.01.2021 Original published format: US202117145815 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202050 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094248 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225, H01L27/32 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/3225 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3208 (CN);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/04164 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0446 (EP,KR);
G09G3/2003 (CN);
G09G3/3607 (CN);
G09G3/3611 (CN);
H10K59/40 (EP,KR);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,KR);
G09G2300/0413 (EP,KR);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,KR);
G09G2320/0223 (EP);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG DER RANDBREITE UM EIN LOCH IM AKTIVEN ANZEIGEBEREICH | [2022/48] | English: | REDUCING BORDER WIDTH AROUND A HOLE IN DISPLAY ACTIVE AREA | [2022/48] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA LARGEUR DE BORDURE AUTOUR D'UN TROU DANS UNE ZONE ACTIVE DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 25.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017294502 (KA JI-HYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]CN107863374 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-20* figure 10 *; | [XYI]CN108831365 (XIAMEN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7,15,17-19 * paragraphs [0034] , [0042] - [0044] - [0072]; figures 2,3,4,7,8 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,9,16 [I] 10-14,20; | [Y]WO2019047126 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0135] , [0137]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]CN109493725 (AU OPTRONICS CORP) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0065]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2019121211 (LUO XIAODONG [CN], et al) [Y] 9,16 * figures 8-10 *; | [Y]WO2019199139 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0084] - [0086]; figure 6B * |