EP4120827 - GRAZING ANIMAL FARMING METHOD AND GRAZING ANIMAL FARMING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Highland Stall & Weide GmbH Hochlandweg 1 27367 Sottrum / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLM, Martin Weyerdeelen 2a 27726 Worpswede / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21714813.9 | 15.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021DE100254 | Priority number, date | DE202010107269 | 17.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107269 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185412 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120827 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01K3/00, A01K11/00 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A01K3/005 (EP);
A01K11/006 (EP);
A01K3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | WEIDETIERHALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND WEIDETIERHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2023/04] | English: | GRAZING ANIMAL FARMING METHOD AND GRAZING ANIMAL FARMING ARRANGEMENT | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLEVAGE D'ANIMAUX DE PÂTURAGE ET AGENCEMENT D'ÉLEVAGE D'ANIMAUX DE PÂTURAGE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |