EP4126776 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION PERMEABLE GLAZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pilkington Group Limited European Technical Centre Hall Lane Lathom Nr. Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAY, Stephen Roland 23 Almond Brook Road Standish Wigan Greater Manchester WN6 0TB / GB | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Andrew James, et al Pilkington Group Limited Intellectual Property European Technical Centre Hall Lane Lathom Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21714937.6 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021GB50721 | Priority number, date | GB20200004302 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004302 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191608 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126776 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C17/06, C03C17/36, B32B17/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C03C17/009 (EP);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/068 (EP,US);
B32B17/10183 (EP,US);
B32B17/10238 (US);
B32B17/1044 (US);
B32B33/00 (US);
C03C17/06 (EP);
C03C17/36 (EP);
C03C17/3626 (EP);
C03C17/3644 (EP);
C03C17/3649 (EP);
C03C17/3655 (EP);
C03C17/3657 (EP);
C03C17/366 (EP);
C03C17/3668 (EP);
C03C17/3681 (EP);
E06B3/6722 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2255/28 (US);
B32B2264/101 (US);
B32B2264/401 (US);
B32B2305/30 (US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2307/416 (US);
C03C2217/48 (EP);
C03C2217/94 (EP);
C03C2217/948 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STRAHLUNG DURCHLÄSSIGE VERGLASUNG | [2023/06] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION PERMEABLE GLAZING | [2023/06] | French: | VITRAGE PERMÉABLE AU RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2006043026 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 3 * claim 8 * [A] 1,2,4-25; | [XYI]WO2014057267 (PILKINGTON GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-6,17-25 * pages 1,3,4, lines 1-10;1-17;23-27; - pages 5,7,9-12, lines 2;23-28;21-24,27-28;3-6,7,23-27;4-12;3-7; figure 1; claims 1-7,16 * [Y] 3 [I] 7-16; | [A]EP3309343 (LAMMIN IKKUNA OY [FI]) [A] 1-25* paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0006] , [0007] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015] - paragraph [0017]; figures 2a,2b,4,5; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0717459 | US5620799 | US5867129 |