EP4128740 - MULTIPLE OPTICAL PATH IMAGING TECHNIQUES AND SHARED EMITTER FOR ACTIVE DEPTH SENSING TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Michael 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
OGUZ, Seyfullah Halit 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21715352.7 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US19725 | Priority number, date | US202063004970P | 03.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004970 P | US202063010447P | 15.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063010447 P | US202016891138 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: US202016891138 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202020 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128740 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04M1/02, G03B5/00, G03B17/17, G03B30/00, G02B5/04, G02B5/08 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G02B26/0816 (EP);
H04N13/271 (EP,KR);
H04N23/55 (EP,KR,US);
G01B11/245 (EP,KR);
G01B11/2513 (EP);
G02B27/106 (EP);
G02B27/141 (EP);
G02B7/14 (EP);
G03B13/30 (EP,KR);
G03B17/17 (EP,KR);
G03B17/20 (EP);
G03B17/54 (EP);
G03B19/22 (EP);
G03B21/00 (EP);
G03B3/10 (EP,KR);
G03B30/00 (EP,KR);
G03B5/00 (EP,KR);
H04M1/0264 (EP,KR);
H04M1/724 (EP,KR);
H04N13/211 (EP,KR);
H04N13/239 (EP,KR);
H04N13/25 (EP,KR);
H04N13/254 (EP,KR);
H04N23/45 (EP,KR);
H04N23/56 (EP,KR);
H04N23/57 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN MIT MEHREREN OPTISCHEN PFADEN UND GEMEINSAMEM EMITTER FÜR AKTIVE TIEFENERFASSUNGSTECHNIKEN | [2023/06] | English: | MULTIPLE OPTICAL PATH IMAGING TECHNIQUES AND SHARED EMITTER FOR ACTIVE DEPTH SENSING TECHNIQUES | [2023/06] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'IMAGERIE À CHEMINS OPTIQUES MULTIPLES ET ÉMETTEUR PARTAGÉ POUR TECHNIQUES DE DÉTECTION DE PROFONDEUR ACTIVE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014218587 (SHAH HARDIK D [US]); | [XI]US2015350569 (ESPERSEN ADAM C [US], et al); | [XI]US2016241764 (LUO NING [CN], et al); | [A]EP3144727 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XA]US2017272650 (LEE SHANG-WEN [TW], et al); | [A]US2017366750 (EVANS V DAVID JOHN [US], et al); | [XI]CN110475053 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) |