EP4121673 - A VALVE FOR FUEL CELL VEHICLE SYSTEMS WITH A SECONDARY SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMB Saleri S.p.A. - Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORONI, Diego c/o Omb Saleri S.p.A. Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | 02 /
MORELLI, Giacomo c/o Omb Saleri S.p.A. Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | 03 /
MONDINELLI, Francesco c/o Omb Saleri S.p.A. Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | 04 /
SANTULLI, Renato c/o Omb Saleri S.p.A. Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | 05 /
PERONI, Davide c/o Omb Saleri S.p.A. Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21715970.6 | 11.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021IB52035 | Priority number, date | IT20200005749 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: IT202000005749 | [2023/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021186303 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121673 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4121673 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/30, G05D16/04, G05D16/10, H01M8/04089, H01M8/04082 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G05D16/0402 (EP,KR);
F16K17/30 (EP,KR);
H01M8/04089 (EP,KR,US);
G05D16/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,KR);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLENFAHRZEUGSYSTEME MIT EINER SEKUNDÄREN SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/04] | English: | A VALVE FOR FUEL CELL VEHICLE SYSTEMS WITH A SECONDARY SAFETY DEVICE | [2023/04] | French: | SOUPAPE POUR SYSTÈMES DE VÉHICULE À PILE À COMBUSTIBLE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ SECONDAIRE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 09.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02084423 (ADVANCED SAFETY TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1396774 (CAVAGNA GROUP SPA [IT]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [A]US2015337769 (YOSHIOKA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072]; figure 12 *; | [A]US2016281871 (KOBAYASHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2017115673 (KOBAYASHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US2016281873 |