EP4117797 - SPECIAL LIGHT EFFECTS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal City Studios LLC 100 Universal City Plaza Universal City, CA 91608 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUTHAMER, Akiva Meir 1000 Universal Studios Plaza Orlando, Florida 32819 / US | 02 /
JEROMIN, Aaron Chandler 1000 Universal Studios Plaza Orlando, Florida 32819 / US | 03 /
GARNIER, Timothy Fitzgerald 1000 Universal Studios Plaza Orlando, Florida 32819 / US | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21716006.8 | 09.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021US21529 | Priority number, date | US202062988221P | 11.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062988221 P | US202016828310 | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US202016828310 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021183531 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117797 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/21, A63F13/28, A63F13/42, A63F13/80, A63F13/90, G06F3/01, H04N9/31 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A63F13/21 (EP,KR);
H05B45/12 (US);
A63F13/28 (EP,KR);
A63F13/42 (EP,KR);
A63F13/80 (EP,KR);
A63F13/90 (EP,KR);
A63G31/00 (EP,KR);
A63J5/02 (KR,US);
G02B5/124 (KR,US);
H04N9/3179 (EP,KR);
H04N9/3194 (EP,KR);
H05B45/10 (EP,KR);
H05B47/12 (EP,KR);
H05B47/125 (EP,KR);
F21W2111/10 (EP,KR);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | SPEZIAL-LICHTEFFEKT-SYSTEM | [2023/03] | English: | SPECIAL LIGHT EFFECTS SYSTEM | [2023/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EFFETS LUMINEUX SPÉCIAUX | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 19.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2023 | Decision despatched | 19.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2005143173 (BARNEY JONATHAN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,17,20 * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0205] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0189] * * paragraph [0192] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0185] * [A] 11-16 [Y] 3,19 [I] 18; | [A]WO2017015067 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [A] 11-16 * paragraph [0004] *; | [Y] - DAN HARTESCU ET AL, "Gaze tracking as a game input interface", COMPUTER GAMES (CGAMES), 2011 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110727), doi:10.1109/CGAMES.2011.6000327, ISBN 978-1-4577-1451-1, pages 126 - 133, XP032044682 [Y] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CGAMES.2011.6000327 | [Y] - Anonymous, "PlayStation Move - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20100627), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=PlayStation_Move&oldid=370488813, (20140624), XP055125047 [Y] 19 * page 3, paragraph starting with "Using different orb colors..." * | [A] - JOHNNY C LEE ET AL, "Moveable interactive projected displays using projector based tracking", UIST 2005 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 18TH ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY , SEATTLE, WASHINGTON, US, ACM, NEW YORK, US, (20051023), doi:10.1145/1095034.1095045, ISBN 978-1-59593-271-6, pages 63 - 72, XP058335915 [A] 11-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1095034.1095045 |