EP4127827 - INTEGRABLE NON-RECIPROCAL OPTICAL COMPONENT, OPTICAL ISOLATOR, OPTICAL CIRCULATOR AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Paris-Saclay Bâtiment Bréguet 3 rue Joliot Curie 91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2024/27] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states Université Paris-Saclay Espace Technologique - Bâtiment Discovery Route de l'Orme des Merisiers - RD 128 91190 Saint Aubin / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABADIAN, Sevag 26 cours Pierre Vasseur 91405 Palaiseau / FR | 02 /
DAGENS, Béatrice 18 rue du Clos de l'Abbaye 92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
MAGNO, Giovanni 23 avenue des Alliés 91120 Palaiseau / FR | 04 /
YAM, Vy 3 rue Jean-Charles Persil 92160 Antony / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21716069.6 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57350 | Priority number, date | FR20200003003 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2003003 | [2023/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191180 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127827 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4127827 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/095, G02F1/35 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/0955 (EP,US);
G02F1/3511 (EP,US);
G02F1/3513 (EP);
G02B6/29349 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERBARE NICHTREZIPROKE OPTISCHE KOMPONENTE, OPTISCHER ISOLATOR, OPTISCHER ZIRKULATOR UND INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | INTEGRABLE NON-RECIPROCAL OPTICAL COMPONENT, OPTICAL ISOLATOR, OPTICAL CIRCULATOR AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2023/06] | French: | COMPOSANT OPTIQUE NON RECIPROQUE INTEGRABLE, ISOLATEUR OPTIQUE, CIRCULATEUR OPTIQUE ET CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 14.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2525200 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [A]WO2013057444 (UNIV PARIS SUD 11 [FR]); | [A]US2014161405 (KIM MIN-SU [KR]); | [A]WO2017136459 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | Examination | EP2525200 | by applicant | FR2981761 | US8849072 |