EP4315505 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLLMER, Andreas 83022 Rosenheim / DE | 02 /
OBERMAYER, Maximilian 83022 Rosenheim / DE | 03 /
GÜLLNER, Martin 83071 Stephanskirchen / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Flach Bauer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 21716331.0 | 30.03.2021 | [2024/06] | WO2021EP58280 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022207077 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4315505 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q9/26, H01Q21/06, H01Q1/52, H01Q19/10 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01Q1/246 (EP);
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
H01Q1/523 (EP,US);
H01Q1/526 (EP,US);
H01Q9/26 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ANTENNE FÜR MOBILE KOMMUNIKATION | [2024/06] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION ANTENNA | [2024/06] | French: | ANTENNE DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 25.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.10.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2333400 (ANDREW CORP [CH]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 10, line 25 - page 14, line 15 *; | [A]WO2011026034 (ANDREW LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** paragraphs [0058] - [0078] *; | [XAI]EP3244483 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0063] * [A] 6,7,10,12-16,18 [I] 5,9,11; | [A]EP3361567 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0048] *; | [A]EP3389139 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0057] * | by applicant | US10553958 |