EP4126309 - EFFLUENT GAS TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELANGANATHAN, Arani Edwards Limited Kenn Business Park Kenn Road Clevedon Somerset BS21 6TH / GB | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Christopher Paul Edwards Limited Kenn Business Park Kenn Road Clevedon Somerset BS21 6TH / GB | 03 /
HOWBROOK, Anna Victoria Edwards Limited Kenn Business Park Kenn Road Clevedon Somerset BS21 6TH / GB | 04 /
STANTON, Gareth David Edwards Limited Kenn Business Park Kenn Road Clevedon Somerset BS21 6TH / GB | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Norton, Ian Andrew Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Norton, Ian Andrew Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21716523.2 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021GB50716 | Priority number, date | GB20200004688 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004688 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198646 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126309 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/46, B01D47/06, B01D47/12, B01D47/14, B01D53/68, B01D53/75, B01D53/78, F23G7/06, F23J15/00, F23J15/02, F23J15/04, B01D53/14 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B01D53/46 (EP,IL);
B01D53/70 (GB,KR);
F23G7/065 (GB,KR);
B01D49/00 (US);
B01D47/06 (EP,GB,IL);
B01D47/063 (KR);
B01D47/12 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D47/14 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D53/1456 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D53/346 (US);
B01D53/75 (EP,IL);
B01D53/78 (KR);
F23G7/06 (EP,IL);
F23J15/022 (EP,IL,KR);
F23J15/04 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D2251/11 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D2252/103 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D2257/2045 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D2257/55 (EP,IL);
B01D2257/553 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D2258/0216 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ABGASBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | EFFLUENT GAS TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2023/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ EFFLUENT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 27.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4364750 (KONCZ ATTILA P) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, lines 18-25 *; | [Y]WO9400224 (PROCESS AND CONTROL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 5, lines 20-29 *; | [Y]WO0067879 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US]) [Y] 1-16 * figure 10 * * page 44, line 16 - page 48, line 8 *; | [Y]WO0132297 (MOORE ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figure 1 * * page 13, lines 9-27 *; | [Y]EP1142621 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] *; | [Y]US6423284 (ARNO JOSE L [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 21 *; | [Y]US6953495 (SCHWAB JAMES J [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, lines 2-9 ** column 7, lines 13-27 *; | [Y]US2005229780 (SPINK EDWARD F [CA], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2010119420 (CHANDLER PHIL [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 21] , [0 31] , [0 32] * |