EP4128376 - PUMP HAVING ELECTROACTIVE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kroener-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPEL, Stephanie Mathystraße 14 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
STÖCKERL, Tobias Irlach 16 93464 Tiefenbach / DE | 03 /
HANNES, David Biedenkopfer Weg 86 60489 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | 04 /
FISCHER, Gerome Neuer Weg 16 99947 Weberstedt / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21716971.3 | 25.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57684 | Priority number, date | DE202010108755 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020108755 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197994 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128376 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/083, F04B17/03, H01L41/193, H02N2/04, A61M1/16 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H02N2/043 (EP);
A61M1/14 (EP);
F04B19/20 (EP);
H10N30/50 (EP);
H10N30/857 (EP);
F05C2231/00 (EP);
F05C2251/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | PUMPE MIT ELEKTROAKTIVEN POLYMEREN | [2023/06] | English: | PUMP HAVING ELECTROACTIVE POLYMERS | [2023/06] | French: | POMPE COMPORTANT DES POLYMÈRES ÉLECTROACTIFS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03081762 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al); | [XY]DE102014218981 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE102016010222 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3490017 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |