EP4128131 - METHOD AND DISPLAY DEVICE FOR PRESENTING PARAMETERS OF A FOOD MACHINE, AND FOOD MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Food Solutions Germany GmbH Im Ruttert 35216 Biedenkopf-Wallau / DE | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CILINGIR, Erdal Schlossstraße 11 57334 Bad Laasphe / DE | 02 /
DE HOOG, Peter Vestesingel 35 6049 LC Herten / NL | 03 /
MAIDEL, Stefan Jörgstraße 5 87437 Kempten / DE | 04 /
THEELEN, Dennis Zandersweg 21 5961 ZL Horst / NL | 05 /
REHN, Jochen Berliner Straße 44 35216 Biedenkopf-Wallau / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21716992.9 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP58329 | Priority number, date | DE202010204259 | 01.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020204259 | DE202010210856 | 27.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020210856 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198274 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128131 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/12, G07F17/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06Q50/12 (EP);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06Q50/04 (US);
G07F17/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON PARAMETERN EINER NAHRUNGSMITTELMASCHINE SOWIE NAHRUNGSMITTELMASCHINE | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD AND DISPLAY DEVICE FOR PRESENTING PARAMETERS OF A FOOD MACHINE, AND FOOD MACHINE | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR PRÉSENTER DES PARAMÈTRES D'UNE MACHINE POUR ALIMENTS, ET MACHINE POUR ALIMENTS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102015103596 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] ** paragraph [0020] *; | [I]WO2016179424 (JUNE LIFE INC [US]) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0150] * |