EP4132649 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF A TYK2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sareum Limited Unit 2A, Langford Arch London Road Pampisford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3FX / GB | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
READER, John Charles c/o Sareum Limited Unit 2A, Langford Arch London Road, Pampisford Cambridge CB22 3FX / GB | 02 /
MARSHALL, Jamie Conor UK Dudley Sterling Place Dudley Cramlington Northumberland NE23 7QG / GB | 03 /
MYKYTIUK, John UK Dudley Sterling Place Dudley Cramlington Northumberland NE23 7QG / GB | 04 /
NORTHEN, Julian Scott c/o Onxy Scientific Limited Units 97 & 98 Silverbriar Sunderland Enterprise Park East Sunderland, Tyne and Wear SR5 2TQ / GB | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Bajjon, Alexander, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21717041.4 | 06.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021EP58864 | Priority number, date | GB20200005114 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: GB 202005114 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021204762 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132649 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61P29/00, A61K31/541, A61P37/00, C07D263/48 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C07D263/48 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/541 (KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
C07B2200/13 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORMEN EINES TYK2-INHIBITORS | [2023/07] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF A TYK2 INHIBITOR | [2023/07] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES D'UN INHIBITEUR DE TYK2 | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 25.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2018073438 (SAREUM LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-18 * claim 5; compound 29 *; | [IDP]WO2020074461 (SAREUM LTD [GB]) [IDP] 1-18* claims 2, 4-9; compound 1F * | by applicant | WO2008139161 | WO2008156726 | WO2009155156 | WO2010005841 | WO2010011375 | WO2010055304 | WO2011113802 | WO2012000970 | EP2634185 | WO2014007466 | WO2014074661 | WO2015032423 | WO2016027195 | WO2018073438 | - HANKSHUNTER, FASEB J.,, (19950000), vol. I and II, pages 576 - 596 | - KNIGHTON et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 253, pages 407 - 414 | - VELAZQUEZ et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 70, pages 313 - 322 | - KUNZ et al., Cell, (19930000), vol. 73, pages 585 - 596 | - GARCIA-BUSTOS et al., EMBO J., (19940000), vol. 13, pages 2352 - 2361 | - YAMAOKA et al., "The Janus kinases (Jaks", Genome Biology, (20040000), vol. 5, no. 12, page 253 | - GRACIE, J. A. et al., "lnterleukin-12 induces interferon- gamma-dependent switching of IgG alloantibody subclass", Eur. J. Immunol, (19960000), vol. 26, pages 1217 - 1221 | - SCHRODER, K. et al., "Interferon-gamma: an overview of signals, mechanisms and functions", J. Leukoc. Biol, (20040000), vol. 75, no. 2, doi:10.1189/jlb.0603252, pages 163 - 189, XP009031305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.0603252 | - KYTTARIS, V.C. et al., "Cutting edge: IL-23 receptor deficiency prevents the development of lupus nephritis in C57BL/6-lpr/lpr mice", J. Immunol, (20100000), vol. 184, pages 4605 - 4609 | - HONG, K. et al., "IL-12, independently of IFN-gamma, plays a crucial role in the pathogenesis of a murine psoriasis like skin disorder", J. Immunol, (19990000), vol. 162, pages 7480 - 7491, XP002188301 | - HUE, S. et al., "Interleukin-23 drives innate and T cell-mediated intestinal inflammation", J. Exp. Med., (20060000), vol. 203, doi:10.1084/jem.20061099, pages 2473 - 2483, XP055111922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20061099 | - CUA, D.J. et al., "Interleukin-23 rather than interleukin-12 is the critical cytokine for autoimmune inflammation of the brain", Nature, (20030000), vol. 421, doi:10.1038/nature01355, pages 744 - 748, XP002971969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01355 | - MURPHY, C.A. et al., "Divergent pro- and anti-inflammatory roles for IL-23 and IL-12 in joint autoimmune inflammation", J. Exp. Med, (20030000), vol. 198, pages 1951 - 1957 | - KARAGHIOSOFF et al., Immunity, (20000000), vol. 13, pages 561 - 671 | - MINEGISHI et al., Immunity, (20060000), vol. 25, pages 745 - 755 | - KREINS et al., The Journal of Experimental Medicine, (20150824), pages 1 - 22 | - SIGURDSSON et al., Am. J. Hum. Genet., (20050000), vol. 76, pages 528 - 537 | - GRAHAM et al., Rheumatology, (20070000), vol. 46, pages 927 - 930 | - HELLQUIST et al., J. Rheumatol., (20090000), vol. 36, pages 1631 - 1638 | - JARVINEN et al., Exp. Dermatol, (20100000), vol. 19, pages 123 - 131 | - MERO et al., Eur. J. Hum. Genet., (20090000), vol. 18, pages 1309 - 1313 | - SATO et al., J. Clin. Immunol., (20090000), vol. 29, pages 815 - 825 | - SHAW et al., PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 11594 - 11599 | - SPACH et al., J. Immunol., (20090000), vol. 182, pages 7776 - 7783 | - OYAMADA et al., J. Immunol., vol. 183, pages 7539 - 7546 | - SCHISCHMANOFF et al., Sarcoidosis Vase. Diffuse.,, (20060000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 101 - 7 | - GHORESCHI et al., Immunol Rev, (20090000), vol. 228, pages 273 - 287 | - GHORESCHI et al., Nature Immunol., (20090000), vol. 4, pages 356 - 360 | - HANCOCK et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19970000), vol. 86, page 1 | - FIRESTEIN, Nature, (20030000), vol. 423, pages 356 - 361 | - ASAKURA et al., World J. Gastroenterol, (20070000), vol. 13, no. 15, pages 2145 - 9 | - SCHON et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20050000), vol. 352, pages 1899 - 1912 | - D'CRUZ et al., Lancet, (20070000), vol. 369, no. 9561, pages 587 - 596 | - MORI et al., Kobe J. Med. Sci., (20160000), vol. 62, no. 4, pages E79 - E88 | - VAN DER FITS, The Journal of Immunology, (20090000), vol. 182, pages 5836 - 5845 | - LIN et al., PLOS ONE | - BAN et al., European Journal of Human Genetics, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 1309 - 1313 | WO2019EP77118 |