EP4132806 - HYBRID POWERTRAIN COMPRISING TWO ELECTRIC MOTORS AND ONE COMBUSTION ENGINE, WHICH ARE NOT COAXIAL, AND THREE COUPLERS, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASSEUR, Bertrand 310 avenue Roger Salengro 92370 Chaville / FR | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [2024/31] | Application number, filing date | 21717391.3 | 06.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021EP58851 | Priority number, date | FR20200003611 | 10.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003611 | [2023/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021204752 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132806 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4132806 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/442, B60K6/36, B60K6/547, F16H3/08, B60K6/387 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
B60K6/442 (EP);
B60K6/36 (EP);
B60K6/387 (EP);
B60K6/547 (EP);
F16H3/091 (EP);
F16H2200/0039 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDANTRIEBSSTRANG MIT ZWEI ELEKTROMOTOREN UND EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR, DIE NICHT KOAXIAL SIND, UND DREI KOPPLERN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2023/07] | English: | HYBRID POWERTRAIN COMPRISING TWO ELECTRIC MOTORS AND ONE COMBUSTION ENGINE, WHICH ARE NOT COAXIAL, AND THREE COUPLERS, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME | [2023/07] | French: | GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR HYBRIDE COMPORTANT DEUX MOTEURS ELECTRIQUES, UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE NON COAXIAUX, ET TROIS COUPLEURS, ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1610038 (GETRAG FORD TRANSMISSIONS GMBH [DE]); | [AD]FR3034386 (RENAULT SA [FR]); | [A]DE102016221058 (AUDI AG [DE]) | by applicant | FR3034386 | FR20190012704 |