EP4144053 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING A CHANNEL, AND ASSOCIATED COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondation B-COM 1219 Avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE MAGOAROU, Luc 35700 RENNES / FR | 02 /
PAQUELET, Stéphane 35700 RENNES / FR | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21717468.9 | 14.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP59711 | Priority number, date | FR20200004203 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2004203 | [2023/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219383 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144053 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04L25/0254 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KANALSCHÄTZUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING A CHANNEL, AND ASSOCIATED COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE CANAL, ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |