EP4104312 - PANEL SELECTION FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION IN A MULTI-TRANSMISSION-RECEPTION POINT (TRP) SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states IDAC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, Delaware 19809-3727 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGHIGHAT, Afshin 1000 Sherbrooke Street 10th Floor Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA | 02 /
CANONNE-VELASQUEZ, Loic 1000 Sherbrooke Street 10th Floor Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA | 03 /
LEE, Moon-Il 111 West 33rd Street Suite 1420 New York, New York 10120 / US | 04 /
HERATH, Prasanna 1000 Sherbrooke Street 10th Floor Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA | 05 /
COMSA, Virgil 1000 Sherbrooke Street 10th Floor Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21717591.8 | 16.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US18210 | Priority number, date | US202062976111P | 13.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062976111 P | US202063091706P | 14.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063091706 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163689 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104312 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | PANELAUSWAHL FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM MIT MEHREREN SENDEEMPFANGSPUNKTEN (TRP) | [2022/51] | English: | PANEL SELECTION FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION IN A MULTI-TRANSMISSION-RECEPTION POINT (TRP) SYSTEM | [2022/51] | French: | SÉLECTION DE PANNEAU POUR TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME À MULTIPLES POINTS DE TRANSMISSION-RÉCEPTION (TRP) | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 10.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2019098520 (KIM JAE HEUNG [KR]) [X] 1-5,10-14 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0206] * * figures 6, 8 * [I] 6-9,15-18; | [XI]US2019123864 (ZHANG QIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-15 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0159] * * tables 6, 7 * * figures 19A, 19B *[I] 7-9,16-18 |