EP4132722 - COATING AGENT PUMP, COATING APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/07] | COATING AGENT PUMP, COATING INSTALLATION AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING METHOD | ||
[2024/30] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - English title | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - French title | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Straße 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Herbert Brückenstraße 46 71384 Weinstadt-Großheppach / DE | 02 /
KUBACH, Erhard In den Hofäckern 10 74239 Hardthausen / DE | 03 /
MICHELFELDER, Manfred In der Au 45 71711 Steinheim / DE | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21718058.7 | 06.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021EP58845 | Priority number, date | DE202010109973 | 09.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020109973 | [2023/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021204748 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132722 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B9/04, B05B12/14, B05B15/58, B05B15/55, F04B23/02, F04B43/06, F04B49/035, F04B43/04, F04B43/02 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
B05B12/1481 (EP,KR);
B05B9/0409 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/58 (EP,KR,US);
F04B23/02 (EP,KR);
F04B43/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | B05B9/04, F04B43/02, F04B43/04, F04B49/035, F04B43/06, F04B23/02, B05B15/55, B05B15/58, B05B12/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMITTELPUMPE, BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGE UND ZUGEHÖRIGES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2023/07] | English: | COATING AGENT PUMP, COATING APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING METHOD | [2024/30] | French: | POMPE À AGENT DE REVÊTEMENT, INSTALLATION DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2024/30] |
Former [2023/07] | COATING AGENT PUMP, COATING INSTALLATION AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING METHOD | ||
Former [2023/07] | POMPE POUR AGENT DE REVÊTEMENT, INSTALLATION DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 22.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1284162 (ITW OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [XDYI]US2006114303 (TELLJOHANN LUTZ [DE]); | [A]DE102006041677 (EISENMANN LACKTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [YD]DE102013003620 (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE10225681 | EP2735739 | DE102013000362 | DE102013003620 | DE102017126651 | EP3725527 |