EP4125568 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO PRODUCE TISSUE IMAGING BIOMARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | ||
For all designated states SUPERSONIC IMAGINE ZAC de l'Enfant 135, rue Emilien Gautier 13290 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. PIERRE, Shawn c/o Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 02 /
FRASCHINI, Christophe c/o Supersonic Imagine Zac de l'Enfant 135 Rue Emilien Gautier 13290 Aix-en-Provence / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Paustian & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21719391.1 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US23904 | Priority number, date | US202063000707P | 27.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063000707 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021195221 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125568 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61B8/08, G06T7/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61B5/0035 (EP,KR);
A61B5/4312 (EP,KR);
A61B8/0825 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,KR,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,KR,US);
A61B6/502 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/4263 (US);
A61B8/469 (US);
A61B8/485 (KR,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/5223 (US);
A61B8/5238 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEWEBEBILDGEBUNGSBIOMARKERN | [2023/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO PRODUCE TISSUE IMAGING BIOMARKERS | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PRODUIRE DES BIOMARQUEURS D'IMAGERIE DE TISSUS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2018008236 (VENKATARAMAN RAJESH [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0110]; figure - *; | [A]WO2019032558 (IMAGO SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-29* paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0192]; figure - *; | [Y] - CHO NARIYA ET AL, "Distinguishing Benign from Malignant Masses at Breast US: Combined US Elastography and Color Doppler US-Influence on Radiologist Accuracy", RADIOLOGY, US, vol. 262, no. 1, doi:10.1148/radiol.11110886, ISSN 0033-8419, (20120101), pages 80 - 90, URL: https://pubs.rsna.org/doi/pdf/10.1148/radiol.11110886, XP055815443 [Y] 1-6,8-14,16-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiol.11110886 | [Y] - LEE EUN JI ET AL, "Combination of Quantitative Parameters of Shear Wave Elastography and Superb Microvascular Imaging to Evaluate Breast Masses", KOREAN JOURNAL OF RADIOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN RADIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, (20200101), vol. 21, no. 9, doi:10.3348/kjr.2019.0765, ISSN 1229-6929, page 1045, XP055815436 [Y] 1-5,7-19,22-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3348/kjr.2019.0765 | by applicant | WO2063US00707 |