EP4158710 - METHOD FOR FUELING FUEL CELL SYSTEMS, AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSE, Christian 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
OLBRICH, Stephan 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
STRAHL, Stephan 70619 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
MANGA, Bilge 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21719573.4 | 14.04.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP59624 | Priority number, date | DE202010206698 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: DE102020206698 | [2023/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239315 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158710 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04082, H01M8/04955 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01M8/04201 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04089 (KR);
H01M8/04303 (US);
H01M8/04388 (KR);
H01M8/0444 (KR,US);
H01M8/04753 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETANKEN VON BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMEN UND BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMVERBUND | [2023/14] | English: | METHOD FOR FUELING FUEL CELL SYSTEMS, AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM ASSEMBLY | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RAVITAILLEMENT DE SYSTÈMES DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE ET ENSEMBLE DE SYSTÈMES DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6964821 (HIRAKATA SYUJI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1, 10 *; | [A]DE102010027881 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]DE102017214975 (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] * * paragraph [0030] * | by applicant | DE10028331 |