EP3997472 - PARALLELIZED MAGNETIC SENSING OF SAMPLES USING SOLID-STATE SPIN SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstr. 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEEG, Andreas 81379 München / DE | 02 /
BUCHER, Dominik 82178 Puchheim / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21719683.1 | 23.04.2021 | [2022/20] | WO2021EP60736 | Priority number, date | EP20200172145 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: EP 20172145 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219516 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997472 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/32, G01R33/30, G01N24/10, G01R33/60, B01L3/00, G01N21/64, G01R33/032 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01R33/323 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP);
G01R33/032 (EP);
G01R33/30 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP);
G01N21/64 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | PARALLELISIERTE MAGNETISCHE ERFASSUNG VON PROBEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FESTKÖRPER-SPINSYSTEMEN | [2022/19] | English: | PARALLELIZED MAGNETIC SENSING OF SAMPLES USING SOLID-STATE SPIN SYSTEMS | [2022/19] | French: | DÉTECTION MAGNÉTIQUE PARALLÉLISÉE D'ÉCHANTILLONS À L'AIDE DE SYSTÈMES DE SPIN À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5616922 (REFFNER JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1,7,12* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1281969 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 12-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]GB2483767 (ELEMENT SIX LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 17 *; | [AD]WO2018052497 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0065]; figure 5a *; | [XAI]WO2018128543 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL], et al) [X] 1,8,13,14,23 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0065]; figure 5a * [A] 6,7,9-11,20-22,26-34 [I] 15,19,24,25; | [XI] - LYKOURGOS BOUGAS ET AL, "On the Possibility of Miniature Diamond-Based Magnetometers Using Waveguide Geometries", MICROMACHINES, CH, (20180601), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.3390/mi9060276, ISSN 2072-666X, page 276, XP055733865 [X] 1,2,5,8,12-14,16-18 * page 4 - page 10; figures 1a,b * [I] 3,4,15,19,24,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/mi9060276 | by applicant | WO2018052497 | WO2018128543 | US2019145919 | - R. SCHIRHAGL et al., Annu. Rev. Phys. Chem., (20140000), vol. 65, pages 83 - 105 | - A. BORETTI et al., Beilstein J. Nanotechnol., (20190000), vol. 10, pages 2128 - 2151 | - D. R. GLENN et al., Nature, (20180000), vol. 555, pages 351 - 354 | - H. ZHANG et al., npj Quantum Inf., (20170000), vol. 3, page 31 | - L. BOUGAS et al., Micromachines, (20180000), vol. 9, page 276 | - Y. ZHANG et al., Diamond and Related Materials, (20110000), vol. 20, pages 564 - 567 |