EP4126853 - SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF INFLUENZA HEMAGGLUTININ [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, California 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLAN, Dennis W. 5435-1/2 La Jolla Blvd. La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Ian A. 1025 Newkirk Dr. La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
YAO, Yao 6520A 34th Ave. NE Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | 04 /
KITAMURA, Seiya 3855 Nobel Dr. Apt. 2322 San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
WU, Nicholas C. 9505 Genesee Ave., Apt. 504 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
KADAM, Rameshwar U. 4178 Decoro St., Apt. 46 San Diego, California 92122 / US | 07 /
LEE, Chang-Chun 9110 Judicial Drive, Unit 8313 San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21719830.8 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24985 | Priority number, date | US202063001914P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001914 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202600 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126853 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, A61K31/5375, A61P31/16 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | KLEINMOLEKÜLIGE HEMMER VON INFLUENZA-HÄMAGGLUTININ | [2023/06] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF INFLUENZA HEMAGGLUTININ | [2023/06] | French: | INHIBITEURS À PETITES MOLÉCULES DE L'HÉMAGGLUTININE DE LA GRIPPE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007106705 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [X]WO2008011130 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010151577 (ROMARK LAB LC [US], et al); | [X]WO2016156816 (MISSION THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US4522811 |