EP4133290 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CAPACITANCE VALUE OF AN EARTHING CAPACITANCE OF AN UNEARTHED POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kristl, Seibt & Co. Gesellschaft M.B.H. Baiernstr. 122A 8052 Graz / AT | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUER, Christian Peter-Tunner-Gasse 53/3 8020 Graz / AT | 02 /
GÖLDNER, Arthur Siedlerweg 9 9583 Faak am See / AT | 03 /
HAIDINGER, Thomas Fasangasse 30 8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/07] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 21720168.0 | 09.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021AT60120 | Priority number, date | AT20200050312 | 10.04.2020 Original published format: AT 503122020 | [2023/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203157 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133290 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4133290 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/18, B60L3/00, G01R27/26 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G01R27/18 (EP,AT);
G01R27/2605 (EP,AT);
G01R27/00 (AT);
G01R27/02 (AT);
G01R27/025 (AT);
G01R27/26 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES KAPAZITÄTSWERTES EINER ERDUNGSKAPAZITÄT EINES UNGEERDETEN STROMNETZES | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CAPACITANCE VALUE OF AN EARTHING CAPACITANCE OF AN UNEARTHED POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER UNE VALEUR DE CAPACITÉ D'UNE CAPACITÉ DE MISE À LA TERRE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE NON MIS À LA TERRE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2357081 (HARMS GERD DR ING); | [A]DE2618303 (BUREAUX DE CONST DE RELAIS ELE); | [A]EP1586910 (DEIF AS [DK]); | [A]DE102012019094 (DOLD & SOEHNE KG E [DE]) | Examination | DE2357081 | EP1586910 | by applicant | EP0654673 | WO2011160881 | EP2256506 | EP3579002 | DE102018117296 |