EP4110588 - MODULAR TRAY FOR POWDER BED ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A ROTATIONAL AXIS PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/01] | MODULAR TRAY FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A PART WITH AN AXIS OF REVOLUTION ON A POWDER BED | ||
[2024/15] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Helicopter Engines Avenue Joseph Szydiowski 64510 Bordes / FR | For all designated states Safran Transmission Systems 18 Boulevard Louis Seguin 92700 Colombes / FR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIFENECKER, Arnaud, Georges Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
ADOR, Jérémi, Christophe, Benjamin Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
AYCAGUER, Frédéric Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
DUFAU, Frédéric, Jacques Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 05 /
GOUIN, Gilles, Gaston, Jacques Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 06 /
WILMES, Jean-Pierre c/o AGS FUSION 35 Route du champ Biolay 01580 IZERNORE / FR | 07 /
ARGUEL, Werner c/o AGS FUSION 35 Route du champ Biolay 01580 IZERNORE / FR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21721154.9 | 31.03.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021FR50566 | Priority number, date | FR20200003422 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003422 | [2023/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205096 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110588 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/153, B29C64/245, B29C64/40, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y80/00, B22F3/105, B22F10/28, B22F10/47, B22F10/66, B22F12/37, B22F12/82, B33Y40/20 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
B29C64/245 (EP,US);
B22F12/37 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (US);
B22F10/66 (EP,US);
B22F12/82 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/30 (US);
B29C64/40 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/28, B22F10/68, B22F10/64, B22F10/66 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/66, B22F2003/247 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/01] | B29C64/153, B29C64/245, B29C64/40, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y80/00, B22F3/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | MODULARER TISCH FÜR DIE ADDITIVE HERSTELLUNG EINES TEILS MIT EINER DREHACHSE AUF EINEM PULVERBETT | [2024/15] | English: | MODULAR TRAY FOR POWDER BED ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A ROTATIONAL AXIS PART | [2024/15] | French: | PLATEAU MODULAIRE POUR LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE SUR LIT DE POUDRE D'UNE PIÈCE À AXE DE RÉVOLUTION | [2023/01] |
Former [2023/01] | MODULARE SCHALE ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG EINES TEILS MIT EINER ROTATIONSACHSE AUF EINEM PULVERBETT | ||
Former [2023/01] | MODULAR TRAY FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A PART WITH AN AXIS OF REVOLUTION ON A POWDER BED | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]DE10342880 (TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [YA]GB2550856 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) |