EP4136901 - NETWORK-INFERRED SYNCHRONIZATION FOR POSITIONING MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
EDGE, Stephen William 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
FERRARI, Lorenzo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
PRAKASH, Rajat 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
FISCHER, Sven 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21721337.0 | 05.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US25781 | Priority number, date | US202063011869P | 17.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063011869 P | US202117221615 | 02.04.2021 Original published format: US202117221615 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021211321 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136901 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H04W64/006 (EP);
H04W64/00 (KR);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
G01S5/0045 (EP);
G01S5/02216 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/0236 (KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
G01S1/68 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | NETZWERKABGELEITETE SYNCHRONISATION FÜR POSITIONSMESSUNGEN | [2023/08] | English: | NETWORK-INFERRED SYNCHRONIZATION FOR POSITIONING MEASUREMENTS | [2023/08] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION INFÉRÉE PAR LE RÉSEAU POUR LES MESURES DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 18.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Comparison of 5GC-LMF and RAN-LMC based Positioning", vol. RAN WG3, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191004), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-195824_(LOCAL LMF BENEFITS), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_105bis/Docs/R3-195824.zip R3-195824_(Local LMF Benefits).docx, (20191004), XP051810037 [Y] 1-46 * figures 6, 7 * | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Stage 2 for Multi-RTT positioning", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191108), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1915558, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_108/Docs/R2-1915558.zip R2-1915558_(TP for mRTT Stage 2).docx, (20191108), XP051817272 [Y] 1-46 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 3.1 * * figures 8.x.3.1.3.1-1 * | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "DL and UL NR Positioning Procedures", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191004), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1913395_(POSITIONING PROCEDURES+DRAFT LPP CR), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107bis/Docs/R2-1913395.zip R2-1913395_(Positioning Procedures+Draft LPP CR).docx, (20191004), XP051804974 [Y] 13,33,42 * page 16, paragraph 3.2 * | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Combined Downlink and Uplink NR Positioning Procedures", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181102), pages 1 - 18, 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1817899_(POSITIONING PROCEDURES), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F104/Docs/R2%2D1817899%2Ezip, (20181102), XP051481785 [Y] 14,15,34,35,43,44 * figure 4 * | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Physical layer procedure for NR positioning", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1910036, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1910036.zip R1-1910036.docx, (20191005), XP051808396 [Y] 7,27 * figure 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2.1.2 * | by applicant | - 3GPP Technical Report (TR) 22.804 | - 3GPP TS 37.355 | - 3GPP Technical Specification (TS) 37.355 | - 3GPP TS 38.455 |