EP4128149 - METHODS FOR ARTHROSCOPIC SURGERY VIDEO SEGMENTATION AND DEVICES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US | For all designated states Smith & Nephew Orthopaedics AG Theilerstrasse 1A 6300 Zug / CH | For all designated states Smith & Nephew Asia Pacific Pte. Limited 29, Media Circle, 06-05 ALICE@Mediapolis Singapore 138565 / SG | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUIST, Brian 150 Minuteman Road An dover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Carlos, A. 150 Minuteman Road An dover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew John, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21721727.2 | 05.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US25704 | Priority number, date | US202063004585P | 03.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004585 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203077 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128149 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/11, G06T7/174 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06V20/49 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/174 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/30008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VIDEOSEGMENTIERUNG IN DER ARTHROSKOPISCHEN CHIRURGIE UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [2023/06] | English: | METHODS FOR ARTHROSCOPIC SURGERY VIDEO SEGMENTATION AND DEVICES THEREFOR | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SEGMENTATION DE VIDÉO DE CHIRURGIE ARTHROSCOPIQUE ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2019362834 (VENKATARAMAN JAGADISH [US], et al); | by applicant | US10342636 | WO2020037308 | WO2020047051 | US20080234444 |