EP4094165 - GEOSPATIALLY INFORMED RESOURCE UTILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUCKER, Brian D. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
BAHNSEN, Robert Bruce Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
MAYSTER, Yan Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Stefanie Janneke, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21721743.9 | 06.04.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US25858 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022216272 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094165 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/29 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G06F16/29 (EP,KR);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06Q30/0246 (US);
G06F16/901 (KR);
G06Q30/0241 (EP);
G06Q30/0242 (KR);
G06Q30/0272 (US);
G06V20/54 (EP,KR,US);
G09F13/005 (US);
G09F15/0006 (US);
G09G5/001 (KR);
G06V40/103 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | GEORÄUMLICH INFORMIERTE BETRIEBSMITTELNUTZUNG | [2022/48] | English: | GEOSPATIALLY INFORMED RESOURCE UTILIZATION | [2022/48] | French: | UTILISATION DE RESSOURCES INFORMÉES DE MANIÈRE GÉOSPATIALE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 26.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2024 | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US8693733 (HARRISON HOWARD JASON [US]); | [I]US2015317687 (RAMESH JAICHANDER [IN], et al); | [XI]US2019050907 (NOMURA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) |