EP4126661 - CLUTCH MECHANISMS FOR STEERING CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodan Marine Systems of Florida, LLC 8297 Blaikie Court Sarasota, FL 34240 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBLER, Lindsay P.O. Box 310 Myakka City, Florida 34251 / US | 02 /
MOGLE, Tom 510 Poinsettia Dr Simpsonville, South Carolina 29681 / US | 03 /
ARMSTRONG, Chuck 7340 225th St E Bradenton, Florida 34211 / US | 04 /
AMBLER, Richard William P.O. Box 310 Myakka City, Florida 34251 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21722008.6 | 25.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24194 | Priority number, date | US202063000773P | 27.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063000773 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021195407 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126661 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/00, B63H25/04, B63H25/02 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B63H20/007 (EP,US);
B63H20/12 (US);
B63H1/14 (US);
B63H20/00 (EP);
B63H20/14 (US);
B63H23/06 (US);
B63H25/04 (EP);
F16D43/206 (US);
F16D7/046 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN LENKUNGSSTEUERSYSTEM | [2023/06] | English: | CLUTCH MECHANISMS FOR STEERING CONTROL SYSTEM | [2023/06] | French: | MÉCANISMES D'EMBRAYAGE POUR COLONNE DE COMMANDE DE DIRECTION | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3915417 (NORTON DON S, et al); | [A]US4555233 (KLAMMER MARK S [US], et al); | [A]US5639272 (HENDERSON WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US2020062365 (ANDERSON NEIL D [US], et al) | by applicant | US2020290714 |