EP4139642 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A SPECTRUM, AND SPECTROSCOPY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ams-OSRAM International GmbH Leibnizstr. 4 93055 Regensberg / DE | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLECHINGER, Gerd Paul-Heyse-Str. 10 93051 Regensburg / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Martin OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Marcel-Breuer-Str. 6 80807 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21722385.8 | 21.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021EP60445 | Priority number, date | DE202010205119 | 22.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020205119 | [2023/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214178 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139642 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4139642 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/10, H01L33/50, G01J3/02 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (US);
G01J3/0256 (EP);
G01J3/108 (EP);
G01N21/55 (US);
H01L33/502 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES SPEKTRUMS UND SPEKTROSKOPIEANORDNUNG | [2023/09] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING A SPECTRUM, AND SPECTROSCOPY ASSEMBLY | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN SPECTRE ET ENSEMBLE DE SPECTROSCOPIE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006164004 (ROSSNER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]DE112016001966 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3370309 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE102018118079 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102018213377 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AP]US2020309348 (SHIBATA YUDAI [JP], et al) |