EP4150754 - CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR AN ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM, AND ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRENGER, Helge 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
ZELTWANGER, Thomas 74379 Ingersheim / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21722853.5 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP61403 | Priority number, date | DE202010205915 | 12.05.2020 Original published format: DE102020205915 | [2023/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021228582 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150754 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02P27/08, H02P23/28, B60L15/20 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H02P23/28 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L53/20 (US);
H02P27/085 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND ELEKTRISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2023/12] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR AN ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM, AND ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE, ET SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 12.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0315204 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JP2005130614 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2008301656 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2011109883 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [XAYI]US2014103843 (BAE SU HYUN [KR], et al); | [XAYI]US2018076744 (WOLF CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) | by applicant | DE102017203668 |