EP4149687 - METHOD FOR CLEANING BLINDING PARTICLES IN CRUSHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubble Master HMH GmbH Im Südpark 196 4030 Linz / AT | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINTERDORFER, Christian 4293 Gutau / AT | 02 /
HINTERREITER, Christian 4593 Obergrünburg / AT | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21723107.5 | 26.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021AT60140 | Priority number, date | AT20200050419 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: AT 504192020 | [2023/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021226643 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149687 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B02C23/12, B02C25/00, B07B1/50, B02C13/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
B02C23/12 (EP,US);
B02C25/00 (EP,AT,US);
B07B1/50 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
B02C13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KLEMMKORNABREINIGUNG BEI BRECHERN | [2023/12] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING BLINDING PARTICLES IN CRUSHERS | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR NETTOYER DES PARTICULES D'OCCULTATION DANS DES BROYEURS | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 27.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE8106180U (MOGGENSEN GMBH&CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * page 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0426651 (LIEZEN MASCHF [AT]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0801995 (UMWELT TECHNICS NORD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5* column 2, line 18 - line 24; figures 1-2 *; | [XI]WO2020049517 (STONE THREE DIGITAL PTY LTD [ZA]) [X] 6 * page 17 - page 18; figure 1; claims 1-3 * [I] 7,8; | [A]CN210411038U (SICHUAN QINGLONG PORYACRYLATE RUBBER MANUFACTORY) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE8106180U | DE20008762U | DE102011001221 |