EP3994902 - METHOD FOR COOPERATIVE RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR PERFORMING MOVEMENT MANOEUVRES IN A ROAD AREA, AND RELATED CONTROL CIRCUIT AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING SUCH A CONTROL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAINER, Julia 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Dominik Michael Audi AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21723224.8 | 03.05.2021 | [2022/19] | WO2021EP61502 | Priority number, date | DE202010115432 | 10.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020115432 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021249695 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994902 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3994902 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/46, H04L9/32, G08G1/01, G08G1/0967, G08G1/07, G08G1/16 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP);
G08G1/0145 (EP,US);
G08G1/096716 (EP);
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
G08G1/096766 (US);
G08G1/096791 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04W4/46, G08G1/16, G08G1/07, G08G1/0967 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOOPERATIVEN RESSOURCENALLOKATION ZUM AUSFÜHREN VON BEWEGUNGSMANÖVERN IN EINEM STRASSENBEREICH SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE STEUERSCHALTUNG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER SOLCHEN STEUERSCHALTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | METHOD FOR COOPERATIVE RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR PERFORMING MOVEMENT MANOEUVRES IN A ROAD AREA, AND RELATED CONTROL CIRCUIT AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING SUCH A CONTROL CIRCUIT | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALLOCATION COOPÉRATIVE DE RESSOURCES POUR L'EXÉCUTION DE MANOEUVRES DE DÉPLACEMENT DANS UNE ZONE ROUTIÈRE, CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT ET VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 01.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP3525158 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] *; | [Y] - LEI ZHANG ET AL, "Blockchain based secure data sharing system for Internet of vehicles: A position paper", VEHICULAR COMMUNICATIONS, (20190401), vol. 16, doi:10.1016/j.vehcom.2019.03.003, ISSN 2214-2096, pages 85 - 93, XP055600646 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * S.86, Spalte 1, Abs 4-5 * * S.88, Spalte 2, Abs 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vehcom.2019.03.003 | by applicant | EP3316657 | CN108492550 | EP3386142 | WO2019154968 |