EP4140115 - COPY PROTECTION METHOD AND COPY-PROTECTED ELECTRONIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETO MAGNETIC GmbH Hardtring 8 78333 Stockach / DE | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARNERKAR, Sharang, Deepak Goethestr. 17 78333 Stockach / DE | 02 /
GREFE, Heike Im Obstgarten 5 78333 Stockach / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21723864.1 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021EP60742 | Priority number, date | DE202010111281 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020111281 | [2023/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214325 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140115 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04W12/069, H04W12/12, B29C45/03 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H04L63/0442 (EP);
H04L9/3268 (US);
B29C45/76 (EP);
H04L63/062 (EP);
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04L9/006 (EP);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/3263 (EP);
H04W12/069 (EP);
H04W12/12 (EP);
H04L2209/84 (EP);
H04L2463/121 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | KOPIERSCHUTZVERFAHREN UND KOPIERGESCHÜTZTES ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM | [2023/09] | English: | COPY PROTECTION METHOD AND COPY-PROTECTED ELECTRONIC SYSTEM | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA COPIE ET SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE PROTÉGÉ CONTRE LA COPIE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 15.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004003249 (DABBISH EZZAT A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,17-21 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0143] * * figures 1, 11,15 * [I] 4,5,8-10,12-16,22; | [A]WO2007148258 (ANAND ASHISH [IN]) [A] 1-22* paragraphs [0007] - [0063] *; | [I]US2017111177 (OGUMA HISASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-22 * paragraphs [0011] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0077] * |