EP4151008 - COEXISTENCE BETWEEN DOWNLINK (DL) POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL (PRS) AND UPLINK (UL) TRANSMISSION IN A FULL DUPLEX USER EQUIPMENT (UE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOTABL, Ahmed Attia San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ABDELGHAFFAR, Muhammad Sayed Khairy San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21724087.8 | 14.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US27360 | Priority number, date | GR20200100250 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: GR 20200100250 | US202017025425 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: US202017025425 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231022 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151008 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W52/14, H04W52/36, H04W72/08, H04W52/24 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP);
H04W64/003 (US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0013 (US);
H04L1/0015 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04L5/0062 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/243 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W72/569 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | KOEXISTENZ ZWISCHEN DOWNLINK (DL)-POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZSIGNAL (PRS) UND UPLINK (UL)-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM VOLLDUPLEX-BENUTZERGERÄT (UE) | [2023/12] | English: | COEXISTENCE BETWEEN DOWNLINK (DL) POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL (PRS) AND UPLINK (UL) TRANSMISSION IN A FULL DUPLEX USER EQUIPMENT (UE) | [2023/12] | French: | COEXISTENCE ENTRE UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT (PRS) DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE (DL) ET UNE TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE (UL) DANS UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) EN DUPLEX INTÉGRAL | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 30.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US10110364 (KIM KITAE [KR], et al); | [XI]US2020083997 (TAKATA TOMOHUMI [JP], et al); |