EP4143429 - MODULAR UNDERWATER PUMPED-STORAGE POWER PLANT RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt-Böcking, Horst Im Vogelshaag 8 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUTHER, Gerhard 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT-BÖCKING, Horst 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21724213.0 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP61424 | Priority number, date | DE202010111844 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020111844 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219854 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143429 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/06 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
F03B13/06 (EP,US);
F05B2240/40 (EP,US);
F05B2250/283 (EP,US);
F05B2250/312 (EP,US);
F05B2260/42 (EP);
F05B2260/422 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | MODULARES UNTERWASSER-PUMPSPEICHERKRAFTWERK-RESERVOIR | [2023/10] | English: | MODULAR UNDERWATER PUMPED-STORAGE POWER PLANT RESERVOIR | [2023/10] | French: | RÉSERVOIR DE CENTRALE D'ACCUMULATION PAR POMPAGE SUBAQUATIQUE MODULAIRE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102011118206 (ROENTDEK HANDELS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,13-17,21,23,24 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0067] - [0074]; figures 2-7 * [I] 4,9-12,18-20,22; | [XI]DE102012110662 (EYHORN ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14-18,21 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figures 3a-5 * [I] 11,13,19,20,22-24; | [X]CN105927455 (INST ENG THERMOPHYSICS CAS) [X] 14-17 * figure - *; | [A]CN108867585 (CHINACOAL ENERGY RES INSTITUTE CO LTD) [A] 1-24* figure . *; | [XP]WO2021005016 (SCHMIDT BOECKING HORST [DE], et al) [XP] 1,14,15 * figure - * | by applicant | DE102011013329 | DE102019118725 | DE102019118726 |