EP4150023 - METHOD FOR STRUCTURALLY CONNECTING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PLASTIC SUBSTRATES USING HEAT-CURING ADHESIVES, MORE PARTICULARLY IN COMBINATION WITH METAL SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARIPOVIC, Dusko 8049 Zürich / CH | 02 /
SIMON, Ilona 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 21724681.8 | 10.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP62368 | Priority number, date | EP20200174798 | 14.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20174798 | [2023/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021228785 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150023 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/06, B32B7/12, B32B15/08, B32B15/20, B32B27/08 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C09J5/06 (EP);
B29C65/3416 (EP);
B29C65/344 (EP);
B29C65/3468 (EP);
B29C65/3492 (EP);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/7826 (EP);
B29C65/8215 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/524 (EP);
B29C66/5326 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29C66/73112 (EP);
B29C66/7422 (EP);
B29C66/91221 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/91951 (EP);
B29C66/949 (EP);
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/3408 (EP);
B29C65/3476 (EP);
B29C66/7352 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/7394 (EP);
B29C66/74283 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/10 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2307/202 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2605/08 (EP);
C09J2203/354 (EP);
C09J2301/314 (EP);
C09J2400/163 (EP);
C09J2463/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/10 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STRUKTURELLEN VERBINDEN VON ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN KUNSTSTOFFSUBSTRATEN MIT HITZEHÄRTENDEN KLEBSTOFFEN, INSBESONDERE IN KOMBINATION MIT METALLISCHEN SUBSTRATEN | [2023/12] | English: | METHOD FOR STRUCTURALLY CONNECTING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PLASTIC SUBSTRATES USING HEAT-CURING ADHESIVES, MORE PARTICULARLY IN COMBINATION WITH METAL SUBSTRATES | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON STRUCTURALE DE SUBSTRATS EN PLASTIQUE ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEURS À L'AIDE D'ADHÉSIFS THERMODURCISSABLES, PLUS PARTICULIÈREMENT EN COMBINAISON AVEC DES SUBSTRATS MÉTALLIQUES | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4560428 (SHERRICK GEORGE O [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - line 59 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 21 * * column 6, line 15 - line 28; figures 1,1a,2; claims 1-8 *[I] 10-13 |