EP4312578 - A PROCESS FOR FAT REDUCTION IN FROZEN DAIRY PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Mills, Inc. Number One General Mills Boulevard Minneapolis, Minnesota 55426 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIMOUNI, Arnaud 69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
PISTRE, Violaine 69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
SCHOPF, Andreas 69110 Sainte Foy Les Lyon / FR | 04 /
ROMERO, Javier 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 21724750.1 | 25.03.2021 | [2024/06] | WO2021IB00194 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022200823 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312578 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/04, A23G9/32, A23G9/52 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23G9/04 (EP,US);
A23G9/32 (EP);
A23G9/327 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FETTREDUZIERUNG IN GEFRORENEN MILCHPRODUKTEN | [2024/06] | English: | A PROCESS FOR FAT REDUCTION IN FROZEN DAIRY PRODUCTS | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE MATIÈRE GRASSE DANS DES PRODUITS LAITIERS CONGELÉS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0147483 (PILLSBURY CO [US]); | [XD]EP1094718 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [XI]EP1400176 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP1094718 | JP2001231457 | EP2936991 | US2015305360 | WO2016075016 |