EP4127918 - A MULTI-PART COMPARE AND EXCHANGE OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O. Box 45157 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALIL, Eran 5 Hashaked St. 3009500 Ramat Yishai / IL | 02 /
OURIEL, Boaz 7 Tarmav St. 3091413 Zichron Ya'akov / IL | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21725982.9 | 01.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021IB00214 | Priority number, date | US202063004735P | 03.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004735 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198784 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127918 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4127918 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/30 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F11/141 (US);
G06F9/3004 (EP,US);
G06F9/30072 (US);
G06F9/3834 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRTEILIGER VERGLEICH- UND AUSTAUSCHBETRIEB | [2023/06] | English: | A MULTI-PART COMPARE AND EXCHANGE OPERATION | [2023/06] | French: | OPÉRATION DE COMPARAISON ET D'ÉCHANGE EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 29.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5742785 (STONE HAROLD STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2002078307 (ZAHIR ACHMED RUMI [US]); | [A]EP1873640 (INTEL CORP [US]) |