EP4132775 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A PREFORM FOR A TURBOMACHINE COMPONENT MADE FROM COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND CORRESOPNDING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINERVINO, Matteo Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
GRELIN, Hervé Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
FROMONTEIL, Didier Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21726149.4 | 09.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021FR50635 | Priority number, date | FR20200003630 | 10.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003630 | [2023/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205132 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132775 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/44, B29C43/12, B29D99/00, B29L31/08, B29K105/06 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
B29C70/446 (EP,US);
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B29B11/00 (US);
B29B11/16 (EP,US);
B29C43/12 (EP);
B29D99/0028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE VORFORM FÜR EIN TURBOMASCHINENBAUTEIL AUS VERBUNDMATERIAL UND ZUGEHÖRIGES BAUTEIL | [2023/07] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A PREFORM FOR A TURBOMACHINE COMPONENT MADE FROM COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND CORRESOPNDING COMPONENT | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PRÉFORME POUR UNE PIÈCE EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DE TURBOMACHINE ET PIÈCE CORRESPONDANTE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 25.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4169749 (CLARK FRANK B [US]) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]US4720244 (KLUPPEL GEORGE E [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [XAI]EP0465169 (HUDSON PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10-12 * figures 6,7,8; claims 1-15 * [A] 5,7,9 [I] 8; | [X]FR2940173 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1* figures 5,6; claim 3 * | by applicant | US4169749 | US4720244 | EP0465169 | FR2940173 |