EP4126702 - A DISPENSING HEAD FOR AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND AN AEROSOL CONTAINER COMPRISING SUCH A HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korczyk, Sebastian Martyniaków 26 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | For all designated states Kadula, Marcin Jabloniowa 44 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | For all designated states Kadula, Wieslaw Ul. Górna 1 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | For all designated states Korczyk, Stanislaw Cegielniana 16/15 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | [2023/25] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states Korczyk, Sebastian Edwarda Bulgi 8/3 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | ||
For all designated states Kadula, Marcin Jabloniowa 44 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | |||
For all designated states Kadula, Wieslaw Ul. Górna 1 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | |||
For all designated states Korczyk, Stanislaw Cegielniana 16/15 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21726181.7 | 22.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021IB52366 | Priority number, date | PL20200433350 | 22.03.2020 Original published format: PL 43335020 | [2023/06] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191776 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126702 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/54, B65D83/20 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B65D83/546 (EP,KR,US);
B65D83/207 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | AUSGABEKOPF FÜR EINEN AEROSOLBEHÄLTER UND AEROSOLBEHÄLTER MIT SOLCH EINEM KOPF | [2023/06] | English: | A DISPENSING HEAD FOR AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND AN AEROSOL CONTAINER COMPRISING SUCH A HEAD | [2023/06] | French: | TÊTE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR UN RÉCIPIENT D'AÉROSOL ET RÉCIPIENT D'AÉROSOL COMPRENANT UNE TELLE TÊTE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 18.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3138301 (WARD LAWRENCE T [US]); | [X]US4953759 (SCHMIDT WILLIAM J [US]); | [XI]JPH0614081U ; | [A]US6273304 (HOSHINO KAZUNORI [JP]); | [X]KR20070016722 |