EP4278603 - CONFIGURABLE POSITIONS FOR AUXILIARY INFORMATION INPUT INTO A PICTURE DATA PROCESSING NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Biao 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
ALSHINA, Elena Alexandrovna 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
GAO, Han 80992 Munich / DE | 04 /
JIA, Panqi 80992 Munich / DE | 05 /
KOYUNCU, Esin 80992 Munich / DE | 06 /
KARABUTOV, Alexander Alexandrovich Shenzhen Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 07 /
SOSULNIKOV, Mikhail Vyacheslavovich Shenzhen Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 08 /
ESENLIK, Semih 80992 Munich / DE | 09 /
IKONIN, Sergey Yurievich Shenzhen Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 10 /
SOLOVYEV, Timofey Mikhailovich Shenzhen Guangdong, 518129 / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 21726228.6 | 01.04.2021 | [2023/47] | WO2021RU00136 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211657 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278603 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/107, H04N19/46, H04N19/117, H04N19/105 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04N19/107 (EP);
G06T9/002 (US);
G06T3/4046 (US);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/117 (EP);
H04N19/46 (EP);
H04N19/103 (EP);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/147 (EP);
H04N19/154 (EP);
H04N19/157 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARE POSITIONEN FÜR ZUSATZINFORMATIONSEINGABE IN EIN NEURONALES NETZWERK ZUR BILDDATENVERARBEITUNG | [2023/47] | English: | CONFIGURABLE POSITIONS FOR AUXILIARY INFORMATION INPUT INTO A PICTURE DATA PROCESSING NEURAL NETWORK | [2023/47] | French: | POSITIONS CONFIGURABLES POUR ENTRÉE D'INFORMATIONS AUXILIAIRES DANS UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2021014531 (PFAFF JONATHAN [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,18,24,26,36-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0163] , [0164] * * figure 8 *; | [XI] - ZHAO LEI ET AL, "Enhanced Ctu-Level Inter Prediction with Deep Frame Rate Up-Conversion for High Efficiency Video Coding", 2018 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20181007), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451465, pages 206 - 210, XP033455036 [X] 1,18,36-38 * abstract * * sections 1, 2, 3, 5 * [I] 2-17,19-35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451465 | [A] - Siwei Ma ET AL, "Image and Video Compression With Neural Networks: A Review", (20190410), pages 1 - 16, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1904.03567.pdf, (20210115), XP055765818 [A] 1-38 * abstract * * sections I.-VI. * | [A] - SHEN LIQUAN ET AL, "SHVC CU Processing Aided by a Feedforward Neural Network", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL INFORMATICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TII.2019.2911708, ISSN 1551-3203, (20191101), pages 5803 - 5815, (20191106), XP011754874 [A] 1-38 * abstract * * section "I. Introduction" * * section "II. Overview of Related Works on Fast CU Processing Methods" * * section "III. Machine Learning Decision Using a Feedforward Neural Network" * * section "IV. CU Processing Based on the Feedforward Neural Network" * * section "VI. Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TII.2019.2911708 | [A] - EGMONT-PETERSEN M ET AL, "Image processing with neural networks-a review", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (20021001), vol. 35, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0031-3203(01)00178-9, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 2279 - 2301, XP004366785 [A] 1,14,18,32,36-38 * abstract * * sections 1, 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(01)00178-9 | [A] - SCHIOPU IONUT ET AL, "CNN-Based Intra-Prediction for Lossless HEVC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, vol. 30, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2019.2940092, ISSN 1051-8215, (20190909), pages 1816 - 1828, (20200701), XP011796774 [A] 1,13,18,31,36-38 * abstract * * sections I., II., III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2019.2940092 | [A] - ALSHINA (HUAWEI) E ET AL, "Description of Exploration Experiments on NN-based video coding", no. JVET-T2023, (20201031), 20. JVET MEETING; 20201007 - 20201016; TELECONFERENCE; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: https://jvet-experts.org/doc_end_user/documents/20_Teleconference/wg11/JVET-T2023-v4.zip JVET-T2023_r3/JVET-T2023_r3_clean.docx, (20201031), XP030293658 [A] 1-38 * section "2.1.3 JVET-T0079 AHG11: Neural Network-based In-Loop Filter" * * section "2.2 EE2: NN-based super resolution" * |