EP4153119 - BARK-FREE, STABLE DOUBLE EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capsum Héliopolis II 126 Boulevard Bara 13013 Marseille / FR | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOUTAYER, Mathieu 35400 SAINT MALO / FR | 02 /
TRUCHET, Marine 56340 CARNAC / FR | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21726671.7 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63596 | Priority number, date | FR20200005410 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: FR 2005410 | [2023/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021234134 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153119 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/06, A61K8/36, A61K8/37, A61K8/60, A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61K8/87, A61K8/92, A61Q19/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A61K8/066 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/602 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61K8/87 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | RINDENFREIE, STABILE DOPPELEMULSION | [2023/13] | English: | BARK-FREE, STABLE DOUBLE EMULSION | [2023/13] | French: | EMULSION DOUBLE STABLE SANS ÉCORCE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2018077977 (CAPSUM [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * page 23, line 32 - page 24, line 2 * * example *; | [Y]WO2018167309 (CAPSUM [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * claims 1,3 * * pages 3, 57 * * page 9, lines 1-7 * * examples 2-6 *; | [Y]WO2019002308 (CAPSUM [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * page 6, lines 6-13 * * claim 16 * * examples 1C, 1A, 2C *; | [A] - MANA TAMAMI ET AL, "Polyurethane-79 Rheology Modifier For Oil Systems", IP.COM, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20180509), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013178616 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * * pages 11-12 * | by applicant | FR1558849 | JPH02295912 | US5783657 | US5874069 | US5919441 | US5981680 | US6051216 | FR2792190 | WO0247619 | WO02056847 | WO2010063937 | WO2012120043 | FR2999921 | WO2015055748 | WO2017046305 | FR3041251 | WO2018077986 | WO2018077977 | WO2018167309 | WO2019002308 | WO2019145424 |