EP4146109 - DUAL WAVELENGTH LASER ABLATION SYSTEMS FOR MRI-GUIDED ABLATION PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Navigation, Inc. 826 Coal Creek Circle Louisville CO 80027 / US | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROWN, Christine Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 02 /
VINCELETTE, Rebecca Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 03 /
SHAH, Roopali Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 04 /
BARNEY, Nicole Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 05 /
EWING, Benjamin Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21726814.3 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021US30292 | Priority number, date | US202063019810P | 04.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063019810 P | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021225906 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146109 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/22 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP);
A61B2017/0023 (US);
A61B2018/00005 (US);
A61B2018/00017 (EP);
A61B2018/00023 (EP);
A61B2018/00446 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00672 (EP);
A61B2018/00678 (EP);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00714 (EP);
A61B2018/00744 (EP);
A61B2018/00761 (EP);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00809 (EP);
A61B2018/207 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2075 (EP);
A61B2018/2261 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | LASERABLATIONSSYSTEME MIT ZWEI WELLENLÄNGEN FÜR MRT-GEFÜHRTE ABLATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/11] | English: | DUAL WAVELENGTH LASER ABLATION SYSTEMS FOR MRI-GUIDED ABLATION PROCEDURES | [2023/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ABLATION LASER À DOUBLE LONGUEUR D'ONDE POUR DES PROCÉDURES D'ABLATION GUIDÉES PAR IRM | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 29.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1958584 (SADE SHARON [IL]) [X] 1,6,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0016] , [0012] , [0025] , [0035] - [0036] - [0040] , [0045] , [0050]; figures 1B, 3 *; | [XI]WO2008153999 (CYNOSURE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * page 27, line 6 - page 37, line 20; figures 1,30,31 *[I] 13; | [X]US2009248004 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0071] , [0171] , [0177] - [0181] - [0197] , [0200] , [0226] , [0237] , [0253] , [0287] , [0383]; figure 3D *; | [X]US2012232534 (RINK JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0036] , [0039] , [0053] , [0081]; claims 12,13 *; | [X]US2014147802 (NALDONI MORENO [IT]) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] - [0041] , [0053]; figure 1; claims 12-17 *; | [X]US2018140866 (DALY JOHN G [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0081] , [0098] , [0109]; figures 1,4,12 * |