EP4157928 - BOPP FILM FOR USE IN CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZNICHENKO, Alexander 06101 Porvoo / FI | 02 /
KERKHOFS, Hans 3583 Beringen / BE | 03 /
WEHENKEL, Kristof 3583 Beringen / BE | 04 /
VERWIMP, Werner 3583 Beringen / BE | 05 /
GLOGER, Dietrich 4021 Linz / AT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21727149.3 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP63571 | Priority number, date | EP20200176697 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20176697 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239594 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157928 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L23/12, H01G4/18, C08F110/06 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR);
C08L23/12 (KR,US);
B29C55/005 (US);
B29C55/12 (KR);
B29C55/16 (US);
C08F110/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/18 (US);
C08F4/52 (US);
C08F4/6494 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (KR);
C08K3/08 (US);
H01G4/18 (EP,KR,US);
H01G4/32 (EP,KR);
B29K2023/12 (US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/0812 (US);
C08K2003/0881 (US);
C08L2203/16 (US);
C08L2203/20 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F4/6494 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/26, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/34, C08F2500/35 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | BOPP-FOLIE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM KONDENSATOR | [2023/14] | English: | BOPP FILM FOR USE IN CAPACITOR | [2023/14] | French: | FILM BOPP DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN CONDENSATEUR | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Observations by third parties | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO02092640 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * WPI abstract * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8, line 10 - line 11 * * page 15, line 1 - line 4 * * page 22, line 3 - line 4 * * claims 1, 3, 6, 10, 15, 64, 65, 68 * * figure 3 *[A] 1-13,15; | [A]US2012010318 (TAN NORIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; example 1 *; | [A]US2018298172 (GITSAS ANTONIOS [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] * * claims 1, 5, 11, 12 * | by applicant | EP2543684 | EP2684676 | EP2701165 | - IEEE Transactions on Dielectrics and Electrical Insulation, (20130000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 937 - 946 | - BUSICO, V.CIPULLO, R., Prog. Polym. Sci., (20010000), vol. 26, page 443 | - BUSICO, V.CIPULLO, R.MONACO, G.VACATELLO, M.SEGRE, A.L., Macromoleucles, (19970000), vol. 30, page 6251 | - ZHOU, Z.KUEMMERLE, R.QIU, X.REDWINE, D.CONG, R.TAHA, A.BAUGH, D. WINNIFORDB., J. MAG, Reson, (20070000), vol. 187, page 225 | - BUSICO, V.CARBONNIERE, P.CIPULLO, R.PELLECCHIA, R.SEVERN, J.TALARICO, G., Macromol. Rapid Commun., (20070000), vol. 28, page 11289 | - ZHOU, Z.KUEMMERLE, R.QIU, X.REDWINE, D.CONG, RTAHA, ABAUGH, D. WINNIFORD, B., J. Mag. Reson, (20070000), vol. 187, page 225 | - BUSICO, V.CARBONNIERE, P.CIPULLO, R.PELLECCHIA, R.SEVERN, J.TALARICO, G., Macromol. Rapid Commun, (20070000), vol. 28, page 11289 | - RESCONI, L.CAVALLO, L.FAIT, A.PIEMONTESI, F., Chem. Rev., (20000000), vol. 100, page 1253 | - WANG, W-J.ZHU, S., Macromolecules, (20000000), vol. 33, page 1157 | - CHENG, H. N., Macromolecules, (19840000), vol. 17, page 1950 | - KAKUGO, M.NAITO, Y.MIZUNUMA, K.MIYATAKE, T, Macromolecules, (19820000), vol. 15, page 1150 | other | WO2009077464 | WO2013127707 | - Anonymous, "Plastics — Determination of the melt mass-flow rate (MFR) and melt volumeflow rate (MFR) of thermoplastics. Part 2: Method for materials sensitive to time temperature history and/or moisture", International Standard, ISO 1133-2, (20111201), pages 1 - 24, XP093107658 | - Anonymous, "Plastics — Determination of the melt mass-flow rate (MFR) and the melt volume-flow rate (MVR) of thermoplastics", International Standard, ISO 1133, Third Edition, (19970115), pages 1 - 16, XP093107661 |