EP4153496 - BLANK AND BOX OBTAINABLE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DS Smith Plc Level 3 1 Paddington Square London W2 1DL / GB | [2023/38] |
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states DS Smith Plc 350 Euston Road London NW1 3AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Russell Monmouth, Monmouthshire NP25 4LZ / GB | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Vanzini, Christian, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/13] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21727446.3 | 19.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63254 | Priority number, date | GB20200007593 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202007593 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021233978 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153496 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4153496 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/28, B65D5/42, B65D5/44, B65D5/54, B65D5/02 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B65D5/445 (EP,KR,US);
B65D5/0227 (EP,KR);
B65D5/28 (GB,KR);
B65D5/02 (GB);
B65D5/42 (GB);
B65D5/44 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSCHNITT UND DARAUS ERHÄLTLICHE SCHACHTEL | [2023/13] | English: | BLANK AND BOX OBTAINABLE THEREFROM | [2023/13] | French: | DÉCOUPE ET BOÎTE POUVANT ÊTRE OBTENUE À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | RS | 28.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1850164 (ANDREWS CHAMPE S); | [A]GB2160506 (UK CORRUGATED LIMITED); | [A]EP2000294 (GHELFI ONDULATI SRL [IT]); | [A]GB2565290 (CHI MING CHOU [TW]) |