EP4153198 - PROBIOTIC BACTERIA FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RRW B.V. Limburgstraat 2 5144 CR Waalwijk / NL | For all designated states van de Wiel, Frederikus Gerardus Josephus Maria Limburgstraat 2 5144 CR Waalwijk / NL | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDWATER, Marjolein 1704NA Heerhugowaard / NL | 02 /
VAN DE WIEL, Frederikus Gerardus Josephus Maria 5144 CR Waalwijk / NL | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21727809.2 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63116 | Priority number, date | DE20201002949 | 18.05.2020 Original published format: DE102020002949 | [2023/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021233901 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153198 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/744, A61K31/00, A61K35/745, A61K35/747, A61P25/28 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A61K35/744 (EP);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K35/741 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | PROBIOTISCHE BAKTERIEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ALZHEIMER KRANKHEIT | [2023/13] | English: | PROBIOTIC BACTERIA FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2023/13] | French: | BACTÉRIES PROBIOTIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]KR20110057550 (ILDONG PHARM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,9-15 * claims; * [Y] 3-8; | [X]WO2013190068 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, lines 26-34; claims; *; | [X]WO2019157585 (PROVIVA PHARMA INC [CA]) [X] 1-15 * Ex 4 on pages 32-38; claims; page 54, lines 8-12; *; | [X]CN111096455 (UNIV ZHEJIANG SIENCE & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-15 * claims. example 1-3; *; | [XY] - JEONG J.-J. ET AL, "Lactobacillus pentosus var. plantarum C29 ameliorates age-dependent memory impairment in Fischer 344 rats", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, vol. 60, no. 4, doi:10.1111/lam.12393, ISSN 0266-8254, (20150204), pages 307 - 314, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1111%2Flam.12393, XP055826537 [X] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/lam.12393 | [XY] - JUNG I.-H. ET AL, "Lactobacillus pentosus var. plantarum C29 protects scopolamine-induced memory deficit in mice", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (20120917), vol. 113, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2672.2012.05437.x, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 1498 - 1506, XP055826543 [X] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2012.05437.x | [XY] - NOVIK GALINA ET AL, "Beneficial microbiota. Probiotics and pharmaceutical products in functional nutrition and medicine", MICROBES AND INFECTION, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MICINF.2019.06.004, ISSN 1286-4579, (20190621), pages 8 - 18, (20190621), XP086021748 [X] 1,2,9-15 * page 14-15, chapter 7 and page 16, chapter 10; * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micinf.2019.06.004 | [XY] - REZAEI ASL ZAHRA ET AL, "Probiotic treatment improves the impaired spatial cognitive performance and restores synaptic plasticity in an animal model of Alzheimer's disease", BEHAVIOURAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 376, doi:10.1016/J.BBR.2019.112183, ISSN 0166-4328, (20190828), (20190828), XP085851731 [X] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbr.2019.112183 | [Y] - KLEIN THOMAS W ET AL, "Therapeutic potential of cannabinoid-based drugs", RETINAL DEGENERATIVE DISEASES: ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY; [ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY ISSN 0065-2598], SPRINGER, US, (20070101), vol. 601, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 395 - 413, XP009107026 [Y] 3-8 * page 404, chapter 5.2; * | [Y] - SIMON WANNINGER ET AL, "Metal complexes of curcumin - synthetic strategies, structures and medicinal applications", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, UK, (20150101), vol. 44, no. 15, doi:10.1039/C5CS00088B, ISSN 0306-0012, pages 4986 - 5002, XP055432857 [Y] 3-8 * page 4996-4997: chapter 5.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CS00088B |