EP4153495 - PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPLA Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH & Co. KG 6971 Hard / AT | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHLE, Thomas 6861 Alberschwende / AT | 02 /
ZMÖLNIG, Christian 6858 Schwarzach / AT | 03 /
SCHNETZER, Daniel 6844 Altach / AT | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21727813.4 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63123 | Priority number, date | CH20200000598 | 18.05.2020 Original published format: CH 5982020 | [2023/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021233906 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153495 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D1/09, B65D35/42, B65D47/10, B65D55/16, A61J1/06 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B65D1/0238 (EP,US);
B65D55/16 (EP,US);
B65D1/095 (EP,US);
B65D35/42 (EP,US);
B65D39/08 (US);
B65D39/16 (US);
B65D47/10 (EP,US);
A61J1/06 (EP);
B65D2205/00 (EP);
B65D2501/0009 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Validation states | MA | 14.12.2022 | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [2023/13] | English: | PLASTIC CONTAINER | [2023/13] | French: | RÉCIPIENT EN PLASTIQUE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1372433 (ANSTATT VARASY) [X] 1-4,15,16 * figures 1-13 *; | [X]DE2714917 (ALPLA DIPL KFM HELMUTH LEHNER) [X] 1-6,8,15,16 * figures 1-4 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 9 * * page 9, lines 15-22 *; | [A]US6168413 (WEILER GERHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [X]EP2147657 (CONTINENTAL PLASTIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] *; | [XI]WO2015028908 (LAMEPLAST SPA [IT]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,15 * abstract * * page 7, lines 28-31 * [I] 16 |