EP4161330 - FOOD PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMAÑES VERA, Victor 50003 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
HERNANDEZ BLASCO, Pablo Jesus 50019 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
MIR BEL, Jorge 50019 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
PARRA BORDERÍAS, Maria 50006 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
VALEAU MARTIN, David 50009 Zaragoza / ES | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21727837.3 | 20.05.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021EP63455 | Priority number, date | EP20200382478 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20382478 | [2023/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021244859 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161330 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/046, A47J43/08 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A47J43/0465 (EP);
A47J43/082 (EP);
A47J43/085 (EP);
H02K49/106 (EP);
H02K49/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/15] | English: | FOOD PROCESSING DEVICE | [2023/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFORMATION D'ALIMENTS | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009135759 (CIE MEDITERRANEENNE DES CAFES [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,13* the whole document *; | [X]US2010214867 (KARKOS JR JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047]; figures 4,5A *; | [X]US2011041704 (FEIERABEND GEORG [CH]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2012291637 (YU CHUNPING [CN]) [X] 1-8,10,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2633791 (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-11,13 * the whole document * |