EP4143063 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A RAILWAY CONVOY, PARTICULARLY FOR THE TRANSPORT OF GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Italia S.p.A. Via Volvera 51 10045 Piossasco (TO) / IT | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASSO, Angelo 14053 Canelli (Asti) / IT | 02 /
TIONE, Roberto 10020 Lauriano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
CORRENDO, Roberto 10022 Carmagnola (Torino) / IT | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Cristinelli, Luca, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21727929.8 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021IB53441 | Priority number, date | IT20200009205 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: IT202000009205 | [2023/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220144 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143063 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22, B60T13/66 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B60T13/665 (EP,KR);
B61H13/20 (KR,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,KR);
B61H13/06 (US);
B61H13/34 (KR,US);
B60Y2200/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | KONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ZUGVERBAND, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN GÜTERTRANSPORT | [2024/33] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A RAILWAY CONVOY, PARTICULARLY FOR THE TRANSPORT OF GOODS | [2023/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE POUR UNE COMPOSITION DE TRAIN, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE TRANSPORT DE MARCHANDISES | [2024/33] |
Former [2023/10] | KONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR EISENBAHN-KONVOI, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN GÜTERTRANSPORT | ||
Former [2023/10] | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR UN CONVOI FERROVIAIRE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE TRANSPORT DE MARCHANDISES | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 24.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6824226 (SMITH JR EUGENE A [US], et al); | [A]US9340195 (SMITH EUGENE A [US]); | [XDI]WO2017025895 (FAIVELEY TRANSPORT ITALIA SPA [IT]) |