EP4133122 - POWER CONVERTER WITH COLOR-ANODIZED ALUMINUM BUSBARS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEISSL, Philipp 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
NEUGEBAUER, Stephan 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21728455.3 | 10.05.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021EP62335 | Priority number, date | EP20200185313 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: EP 20185313 | [2023/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008122 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133122 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/02, C25D11/14, C25D11/18, C25D11/24, H01R4/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C25D11/022 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (US);
C25D11/18 (EP);
C25D11/243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | STROMRICHTER MIT FARBIG ELOXIERTEN ALUMINIUMSTROMSCHIENEN UND HERSTELLVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN DERARTIGEN STROMRICHTER | [2023/07] | English: | POWER CONVERTER WITH COLOR-ANODIZED ALUMINUM BUSBARS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A POWER CONVERTER | [2023/07] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE À BARRES OMNIBUS EN ALUMINIUM ANODISÉES EN COULEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 11.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2204473 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 3 * * claims 1, 3 *; | [X]US2015132602 (SUN JENNIFER Y [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 5 ** paragraphs [0064] - [0070] *; | [X]WO2015084331 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IT CORP [US]) [X] 2-4 * abstract * * figures 1, 3 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 11 * |