EP3983644 - APPARATUS FOR, AND METHOD OF, CONTROLLING SAND PRODUCTION FROM AN OIL WELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR, IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fourphase AS Hegglandsdalsvegen 271 5211 Os / NO | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKÅLAND, Aksel 5211 Os / NO | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2022/16] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 21728894.3 | 26.05.2021 | [2022/16] | WO2021EP64003 | Priority number, date | GB20200007998 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202007998 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239791 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983644 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3983644 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
E21B43/12 (EP,GB,US);
E21B43/35 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER SANDPRODUKTION AUS EINEM ÖLBOHRLOCH | [2022/16] | English: | APPARATUS FOR, AND METHOD OF, CONTROLLING SAND PRODUCTION FROM AN OIL WELL | [2022/16] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À RÉGULER LA PRODUCTION DE SABLE EN PROVENANCE D'UN PUITS DE PÉTROLE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | IE | 26.05.2023 | LU | 26.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 26.05.2023 | ||
LU | 26.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 26.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 26.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A] - ANDERS AREFJORD ET AL, "Sand Management - The Key to EOR from Mature Fields. Research into Multiple Production Optimization Applications (SPE-191312-MS)", SPE NORWAY ONE DAY SEMINAR, (20180418), doi:10.2118/191312-MS, pages 1 - 12, XP055767325 [A] 1-27 * Pages 8-9: "Sand strategy optimization on GFC" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/191312-MS | [A] - O. L. ISHOMO ET AL, "Optimizing Usari Field Production Through Effective Sand Management (SPE-193498-MS)", SPE NIGERIA ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, (20180806), doi:10.2118/193498-MS, pages 1 - 17, XP055767327 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/193498-MS | by applicant | WO2016075317 |