EP4139802 - METHODS FOR MANAGING INPUT-OUPUT OPERATIONS IN ZONE TRANSLATION LAYER ARCHITECTURE AND DEVICES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 1395 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLE, Abhijeet Prakash 1462 Rose Garden Ln. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Rohit Shankar 208 Castle Hayne Dr Cary, NC 27519 / US | 03 /
DOUCETTE, Douglas P. 11599 Punta Dulcina San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 04 /
GUPTA, Ratnesh 5369 Eaglebrook Ter Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 05 /
SEN, Sourav 10124 Parkwood Drive, Apt. 6 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
DESHPANDE, Prathamesh 150 Hopfield Dr. Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2023/09] | 01 /
GOLE, Abhijeet, Prakash 1462 Rose Garden Ln. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
SINGH, Rohit, Shankar 208 Castle Hayne Dr Cary, NC 27519 / US | |||
03 /
DOUCETTE, Douglas, P. 11599 Punta Dulcina San Diego, CA 92131 / US | |||
04 /
GUPTA, Ratnesh 5369 Eaglebrook Ter Dublin, CA 94568 / US | |||
05 /
SEN, Sourav 10124 Parkwood Drive, Apt. 6 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
DESHPANDE, Prathamesh 150 Hopfield Dr. Folsom, CA 95630 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21729072.5 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021US28876 | Priority number, date | US202016857995 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: US202016857995 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217021 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139802 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4139802 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F3/06 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP);
G06F12/10 (US);
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0644 (EP);
G06F3/0659 (EP);
G06F3/0679 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON EINGABE-AUSGABE-OPERATIONEN IN EINER ZONENÜBERSETZUNGSSCHICHTARCHITEKTUR UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [2023/09] | English: | METHODS FOR MANAGING INPUT-OUPUT OPERATIONS IN ZONE TRANSLATION LAYER ARCHITECTURE AND DEVICES THEREOF | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION D'OPÉRATIONS D'ENTRÉE-SORTIE DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE DE COUCHE DE TRANSLATION DE ZONE ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 21.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019146907 (FROLIKOV ALEX [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0057] - [0078] - [ 101] - [0104] - paragraphs [0120] - [0123]; figures 3-5, 8,11 *; | [A]US2019179570 (BAHIRAT SHIRISH [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0015] , [0 27] - [0039] - paragraphs [0047] - [0051]; figures 1, 4, 7-9 *; | [Y]US2020089407 (BACA JIM S [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 19] - [0034]; figures 1,3A,3B, 4-5 * |